|
05/07/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-149
|
|
|
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 430747 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|