LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0285
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0285
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0285
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
October 26, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 21, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 5, 2024
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 8, 2024
Analysis
March 13, 2024
Analysis
January 23, 2024
Analysis
January 19, 2024
Analysis
January 18, 2024
Analysis
January 16, 2024
Analysis
December 6, 2023
Analysis
November 29, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
January 18, 2024
Compare
Bill
December 6, 2023
Compare