|
04/11/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-71
|
|
|
|
04/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/08/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 312
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Amendment 711849 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/17/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/22/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|