House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|