Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024