Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment(s) failed (670730)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 33
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|