Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0347 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024