|
04/02/2024
|
Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Substituted for SM 540
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/23/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|