|
04/08/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-65
|
|
|
|
04/05/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 346
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/23/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|