Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 14, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis December 13, 2023
Analysis December 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 17, 2024