Florida 2024 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0357 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 04/16/2024

                     
This document does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0357z1.CRG.docx 
DATE: 4/16/2024 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF FINAL BILL ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: CS/HB 357    Special Observances 
SPONSOR(S): State Affairs Committee, Holcomb and others 
TIED BILLS:   IDEN./SIM. BILLS: CS/SB 346 
 
 
 
 
FINAL HOUSE FLOOR ACTION: 117 Y’s 
 
0 N’s GOVERNOR’S ACTION: Approved 
 
 
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
CS/HB 357 passed the House on January 24, 2024, and subsequently passed the Senate on February 14, 
2024. 
 
Florida Law provides designations for legal holidays and special observances. Recognition of a legal holiday or 
special observance could apply statewide or may be limited to a particular region of the state. Some holidays 
or special observances may also require a commemoration or observance of the day, week, or month. 
 
Florida currently recognizes “Veterans’ Day” as a legal holiday that is celebrated annually on November 11, 
and in 2023, the Legislature established “Veterans Week” as a special observance. 
 
The bill replaces “Veterans Week” special observance by designating the month of November as “Veterans 
Appreciation Month.” The Governor may issue an annual proclamation designating the month of November as 
Veterans Appreciation Month and encouraging counties, municipalities, public schools, and Florida residents to 
observe the occasion by creating special programs and events to show appreciation for the veterans who have 
served the United States.  
 
The bill does not appear to have a fiscal impact on the state or local governments. 
 
The bill was approved by the Governor on April 5, 2024, ch. 2024-65, L.O.F., and will become effective on July 
1, 2024. 
    
STORAGE NAME: h0357z1.CRG.docx 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 4/16/2024 
  
I. SUBSTANTIVE INFORMATION 
 
A. EFFECT OF CHANGES:  
 
Background 
 
Legal Holidays and Special Observances 
Florida law designates a number of legal holidays and special observances.
1
 Recognition of a 
legal holiday or special observance may apply statewide or may be limited to a particular region. 
For example, “Gasparilla Day”
2
 is a legal holiday observed only in Hillsborough County, while 
“Bill of Rights Day”
3
 applies throughout the state.  
 
Depending on the holiday or special observance, certain actions may be required to be 
performed for the commemoration or observance of the date, day, or month. For example, April 
2 is designated as “Florida State Day” which is to be known as “Pascua Florida Day,”
4
 
regardless of whether the Governor issues a proclamation. However, the Governor is required 
to proclaim September 11 as “9/11 Hero’s Day” and public schools must observe such day.
5
 
 
Florida law currently recognizes 21 legal holidays
6
 and 38 special observances.
7
 The state also 
recognizes nine paid holidays that are observed by all state branches and agencies.
8
  
 
Veterans Recognition 
“Veterans’ Day” is a legal holiday that is celebrated annually on November 11.
9
 In 2023, 
“Veterans Week” was established by the Legislature as a special observance, which begins on 
the Sunday preceding November 11 of each year.
10
 However, if November 11 is on a Sunday, 
then Veterans Week begins on that day.
11
  
 
Veterans in Florida 
Each year, about 250,000 servicemembers end military service as veterans and either reenter the 
civilian workforce or enroll in higher education.
12
 Florida is home to 20 major military installations
13
 and 
                                                
1
 See ch. 683, F.S. 
2
 S. 683.08, F.S. 
3
 S. 683.25, F.S. 
4
 S. 683.06(1), F.S. 
5
 S. 683.335(1), F.S. 
6
 S. 683.01, F.S. Legal holidays that are also public holidays include Sunday, the first day of each week; New Year’s Day, January 1; 
Birthday of Martin Luther King, Jr., January 15; Birthday of Robert E. Lee, January 19; Lincoln’s Birthday, February 12; Susan B. 
Anthony’s Birthday, February 15; Washington’s Birthday, the third Monday in February; Good Friday; Pascua Florida Day, April 2; 
Confederate Memorial Day, April 26; Memorial Day, the last Monday in May; Birthday of Jefferson Davis, June 3; Flag Day, June 
14; Independence Day, July 4; Labor Day, the first Monday in September; Columbus Day and Farmers’ Day, the second Monday in 
October; Veterans’ Day, November 11; General Election Day; Thanksgiving Day, the fourth Thursday in November; Christmas Day, 
December 25; and Shrove Tuesday, sometimes also known as “Mardi Gras,” in counties where carnival associations are organized for 
the purpose of celebrating the same. 
7
 See ss. 683.04 - 683.335, F.S 
8
 S. 110.117(1), F.S. Paid state holidays include New Year’s Day, the Birthday of Martin Luther King, Jr., Memorial Day, 
Independence Day, Labor Day, Veterans’ Day, Thanksgiving Day, the Friday after Thanksgiving, and Christmas Day. 
9
 S. 683.01(1)(q), F.S. 
10
 S. 683.1475, F.S. 
11
 Id. 
12
 U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Your VA Transition Assistance Program (TAP), available at 
https://www.benefits.va.gov/transition/tap.asp (last visited February 15, 2024).  
13
 Florida Department of Commerce, Military Bases – Military Base Encroachment, available at https://floridajobs.org/community-
planning-and-development/programs/community-planning-table-of-contents/military-base-encroachment (last visited February 15, 
2024).   
STORAGE NAME: h0357z1.CRG.docx 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 4/16/2024 
  
65,159 active duty military personnel with 37,833 more in the National Guard or in reserve.
14
 Florida is 
also home to the nation’s third-largest veteran population with 1,430,000 veterans.
15
  
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
The bill replaces the “Veterans Week” special observance by designating the month of November each 
year as “Veterans Appreciation Month.” 
 
The Governor may issue a proclamation annually designating the month of November as Veterans 
Appreciation Month and encouraging counties, municipalities, public schools, and Florida residents to 
observe the occasion by creating special programs and events to show appreciation for the veterans 
who have served the United States. 
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
  
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
 
None. 
 
 
 
 
                                                
14
 Department of Defense, Defense Manpower Data Center (DMDC), DoD Personnel, Workforce Reports & Publications - Military 
and Civilian Personnel by Service/Agency by State/Country (September 2023), available at https://dwp.dmdc.osd.mil/dwp/app/dod-
data-reports/workforce-reports (last visited February 15, 2024)  
15
 Florida Department of Veterans Affairs. Fast Facts, available at https://www.floridavets.org/our-veterans/profilefast-facts/ (last 
visited February 15, 2024).