House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Original reference removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|