Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0365 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 7, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024