|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-28
|
|
|
|
03/22/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 655234 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (655234)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted for SB 648
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|