House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|