LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0401
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0401
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0401
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
November 9, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 30, 2024
Analysis
March 13, 2024
Analysis
January 17, 2024
Analysis
January 12, 2024
Analysis
January 10, 2024
Analysis
January 8, 2024
Analysis
December 6, 2023
Analysis
December 1, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
January 18, 2024
Compare