House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | PCS added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Filed |