|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-174
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 192
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 105, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 699785 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/18/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/12/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|