Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0437 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2024
Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis December 13, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 16, 2024
Bill December 13, 2023