House
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1764
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/SB 1764
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
PCS added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|