Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024
Bill January 26, 2024