Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 119, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|