House
|
07/10/2024
|
Veto Message received
|
|
|
|
06/26/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 32 NAYS 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 658
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|