Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0473 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024