Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0505 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024