House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Original reference removed: Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Original reference removed: Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|