Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 5, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill February 2, 2024