House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|