Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 10, 2024