Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024