|
04/16/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-94
|
|
|
|
04/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 319730 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (319730)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted for SB 590
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
PCS added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|