Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 11, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024