House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Filed |