Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0545 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 27, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024