House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|