Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0553 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024