House | 03/08/2024 | Died on Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/20/2023 | Filed |