Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0593 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024