Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0609 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024