|
06/28/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-271
|
|
|
|
06/27/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1534
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|