Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 1, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2024
Bill January 12, 2024