House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Original reference removed: Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|