Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0635 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024