House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Reported out of Select Committee on Health Innovation | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Select Committee on Health Innovation | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Added to Select Committee on Health Innovation agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Filed |