Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0659 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 15, 2024