House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|