Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024
Analysis January 5, 2024