House | 03/08/2024 | Died in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Filed |