Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0727 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024