Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 3, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024